NH HB1262 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to online driver education.
Title
Relative to online driver education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - OTP (Y: 233 N: 94 NV: 22 Abs: 43) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/26/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/17/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 233-94 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 50 |
2018-03-08 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-08 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-02-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-02-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 65 |
2018-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 4 |