NH HB1262 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the application of zoning ordinances to home-based businesses.
Title
Relative to the application of zoning ordinances to home-based businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 53 |
2016-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 13-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 33 |
2016-02-09 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2016-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 4 P. 8 |