NH HB1262 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-19 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/2/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting banks from requiring blood samples, fingerprints, and DNA samples in order to complete a banking transaction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting banks from requiring blood samples, fingerprints, and DNA samples in order to complete a banking transaction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-15 - House - RFS (Y: 208 N: 86 NV: 52 Abs: 51) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-19 House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/2/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2012-09-07 House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/18/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 =Banking Div=
2012-06-07 House Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs for Interim Study; House Calendar 45, PG.2432
2012-03-15 House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 208-86; House Journal 26, PG.1638
2012-03-07 House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Webb); House Journal 21, PG.1284
2012-02-17 House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Mar 7 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 19, PG.1143
2012-02-09 House Executive Session: 2/16/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2012-02-08 House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/16/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2012-01-17 House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/24/2012 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 ==Banking Div==
2011-12-15 House Public Hearing: 1/17/2012 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 =Banking Div=
2011-11-18 House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 7, PG.349

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback