NH HB1250 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 13, PG.792
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 13, PG.792
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing designated persons to provide emergency medical treatment to another person.
Title
Allowing designated persons to provide emergency medical treatment to another person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 13, PG.792 | |
2012-02-01 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Bergevin); House Journal 13, PG.739 | |
2012-01-19 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 1 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 4, PG.211 | |
2011-12-14 | House Public Hearing: 1/10/2012 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2011-11-18 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 7, PG.349 |