NH HB1249 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the commission on the interdisciplinary primary care workforce; relative to multicounty grand juries; and allowing remote notarization of paper estate planning documents during the COVID-19 state of emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the commission on the interdisciplinary primary care workforce; relative to multicounty grand juries; and allowing remote notarization of paper estate planning documents during the COVID-19 state of emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 224 N: 105 NV: 23 Abs: 39) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-10HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10
2020-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-06-30HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Long): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 224-105 06/30/2020
2020-06-29SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-1570s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9
2020-06-29SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1570s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9
2020-06-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1570s, 06/29/2020; Senate Calendar 25
2020-06-24Senate==RECONVENE== Remote Hearing: 06/24/2020, 09:45 am, on proposed amendment # 2020-1550s; Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19SenateThe following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19Senate6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19Senate5. Webinar ID: 949 5457 3376 Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19Senate4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13126266799,,94954573376# or 19292056099,,94954573376# Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19Senate3. To listen via telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799, or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19Senate2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19Senate1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_QH1esiFMQNC5q9CjM5O_jA Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19SenateMembers of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19SenateCommittee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19Senate==RECESSED== Remote Hearing: 06/24/2020, 08:40 am, on proposed amendment # 2020-1550s; Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-19SenateRemote Hearing: 06/24/2020, 08:35 am; Senate Calendar 24
2020-06-18SenateIntroduced 06/16/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0655h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020
2020-03-11HouseAmendment # 2020-0655h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020
2020-03-04HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0655h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 3
2020-02-19HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2020-02-19HousePublic Hearing: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback