NH HB1245 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2020; Chapter 37; I. Sec. 136-39/ 40-42/ 47-79/ 86-92/ 102-104/ 119/ 142 Eff: 09/27/2020 II. Sec. 80-83 & 93 Eff: 01/01/2021 III. Sec. 97-99 and 120-126 Eff: 07/01/2020 IV. Sec. 101 Eff: 11/01/2021 V. Rem. Eff: 07/29/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adopting omnibus legislation concerning state agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopting omnibus legislation concerning state agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 351 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - Committee Amendment Sections 105-118 and 155 (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/29/2020; Chapter 37; I. Sec. 136-39/ 40-42/ 47-79/ 86-92/ 102-104/ 119/ 142 Eff: 09/27/2020 II. Sec. 80-83 & 93 Eff: 01/01/2021 III. Sec. 97-99 and 120-126 Eff: 07/01/2020 IV. Sec. 101 Eff: 11/01/2021 V. Rem. Eff: 07/29/2020
2020-07-16SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-07-16HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 74
2020-07-10HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1625: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 72
2020-07-10SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1625e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-06-30HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Wall): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 190-127 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 55
2020-06-17SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2020-1425s and 2020-1501s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-17SenateSen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2020-1501s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1425s: Sections 1-104 and Sections 119-155, Amendment Adopted,Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1425s: Sections 105-118 and 155, Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Amendment Adopted; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateThe Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateSen. Bradley Moved to divide the Question on Committee Amendment 2020-1425s: Sections 105-118, and Sections 1-104 and Sections 119-155; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1425s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23
2020-06-05SenateThe following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate5. Webinar ID: 969 7767 9197 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13126266799,,96977679197# or +19292056099,,96977679197# Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate3. To listen via telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_h44WQAbGQY2sJ8jzW9buaA Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateMembers of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateCommittee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/09/2020, 02:40 pm, on proposed amendment # 2020-1382s; Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/09/2020, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-01SenateIntroduced 03/12/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0919h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 42
2020-03-11HouseAmendment # 2020-0919h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 42
2020-03-05HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0919h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 24
2020-02-21HousePublic Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2020-0717h: 03/02/2020 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 303
2020-02-05HousePublic Hearing: 03/02/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2020-02-04House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/13/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2020-01-21HouseExecutive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2020-01-21House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/19/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 1 P. 15

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2515&sy=2020&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1245
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&id=1652&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1652
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1652
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=80&sy=2020&lb=S&eb=HB1245&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1245&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2515
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=200&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB1245&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1245&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2515

Bill Comments

feedback