NH HB1242 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 228-89; House Journal 13, PG.783
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 228-89; House Journal 13, PG.783
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to membership dues paid by towns.
Title
Relative to membership dues paid by towns.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Antosz [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. Seth Cohn [R] |
Rep. Gary Hopper [R] | Rep. Laura Jones [R] | Rep. Andrew Manuse [R] | Rep. Lisa Scontsas [R] |
Rep. Stella Tremblay [R] | Rep. Mark Warden [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 228-89; House Journal 13, PG.783 | |
2012-01-26 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 5, PG.253 | |
2012-01-26 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 1 (Vote 16-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 5, PG.253 | |
2012-01-17 | House Public Hearing: 1/25/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2011-11-16 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 7, PG.348 |