NH HB1237 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-26 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-26 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of unmarked or stealth police vehicles for traffic enforcement.
Title
Relative to the use of unmarked or stealth police vehicles for traffic enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Phinney [L] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Jonah Wheeler [D] | Rep. Tom Mannion [R] |
Rep. Emily Phillips [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 05/02/2024; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 03/26/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-01 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0345h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 14 |
2024-02-01 | House | FLAM # 2024-0345h (Rep. A. Murray): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 14 |
2024-02-01 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed DV 162-213 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 13 |
2024-01-24 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2024-01-24 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 01/19/2024 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 4 P. 12 |
2024-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 01/19/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |