NH HB1237 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 02/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study the requirements of reporting by utility companies of information required for valuation of certain utility property for purposes of RSA 72.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study the requirements of reporting by utility companies of information required for valuation of certain utility property for purposes of RSA 72.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseReferral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 02/19/2020
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Ways and Means 02/19/2020
2020-02-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0617h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020
2020-02-19HouseAmendment # 2020-0617h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020
2020-02-13HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0617h (NT) for 02/19/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 14
2020-02-04HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2020-02-04HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2020-01-22HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/23/2020 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 304
2020-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/15/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 14

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback