NH HB1237 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/06/2016; Chapter 209; Eff. 6/6/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/06/2016; Chapter 209; Eff. 6/6/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the establishment of a conflict management and resolution system for parents and children.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the establishment of a conflict management and resolution system for parents and children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/06/2016; Chapter 209; Eff. 6/6/2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 29 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1784s (Rep. Gargasz): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 20 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1784s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1784s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2016 Senate Journal 16 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1784s, New Title, 05/05/2016; Senate Calendar 17 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Hearing: 04/29/2016, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 3 |
2016-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/09/2016 (Vote 10-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 2 |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2016 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building206 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 4 P. 7 |