NH HB1234 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the seal of the general court.
Title
Relative to the seal of the general court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-26 - House - Test Vote (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 343 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 49 |
2016-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 7-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 30 |
2016-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2016 10:20 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2016-01-26 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2016 09:50 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 4 P. 7 |