NH HB1232 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/22/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97236261808 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the burden of proof in special education hearings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the burden of proof in special education hearings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-19HouseFull Committee Work Session: 09/22/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97236261808 - Executive Session to Follow
2020-03-12HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 14
2020-03-03HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2020-03-03HouseMajority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 45
2020-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 02/26/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2020-02-05HousePublic Hearing: 02/12/2020 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 14

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback