NH HB1225 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing increased net energy metering limits for municipal hydroelectric facilities.
Title
Allowing increased net energy metering limits for municipal hydroelectric facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael O'Brien [D] | Rep. Laura Telerski [D] | Rep. Bruce Cohen [D] | Rep. Skip Cleaver [D] |
Rep. Mark King [D] | Rep. Suzanne Vail [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-03-13 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Backus): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 179 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 70 |
2020-02-12 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/18/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-02-05 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/10/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-02-04 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-02-04 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 02/07/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/29/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2020 02:45 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 14 |