NH HB1225 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/02/2016; Chapter 32; Eff. 7/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Signed by Governor Hassan 05/02/2016; Chapter 32; Eff. 7/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting high school students who are members of the armed forces to wear their uniforms at graduation.
Title
Permitting high school students who are members of the armed forces to wear their uniforms at graduation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 05/02/2016; Chapter 32; Eff. 7/1/2016 |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 51 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/21/2016); Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/07/2016; Senate Journal 12 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/07/2016; Senate Calendar 13 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2016, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-10 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0613h: Motion Adopted DV 292-12 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 91 |
2016-03-10 | House | Amendment #2016-0613h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 91 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0613h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 89 |
2016-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 02/02/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building207 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Education House Journal 4 P. 6 |