NH HB1225 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adding the choice of "none of the above" to state election ballots.
Title
Adding the choice of "none of the above" to state election ballots.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/30/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/16/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Election Law |