NH HB1218 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increasing penalties for buyers under the law regarding trafficking in persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing penalties for buyers under the law regarding trafficking in persons.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 5
2018-01-31HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/22/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 5
2018-01-26HouseExecutive Session: 01/16/2018 Legislative Office Building 204
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/11/2018 10:20 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2017-11-07HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback