NH HB1217 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to agency reporting of state-owned property.
Title
Relative to agency reporting of state-owned property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 01/12/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote ; 19-0) |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2022 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-11-18 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Public Works and Highways |