NH HB1214 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-18 - Executive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-18 - Executive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the sale of certain furniture with flame retardant chemicals.
Title
Prohibiting the sale of certain furniture with flame retardant chemicals.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Chandler [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] | Rep. Mindi Messmer [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | House | Executive Session: 10/02/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building302 |
2018-08-22 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building302 |
2018-03-22 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted DV 175-160 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 7 |
2018-03-16 | House | Suspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69 |
2018-03-08 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-08 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-03-06 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Goley) 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 4 |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 5 |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 3 |