NH HB1213 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to legal holidays.
Title
Relative to legal holidays.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Ivy Vann [D] | Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] |
Rep. Mark King [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-01-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2022 1:15 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-11-18 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |