NH HB121 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the regulation of massage, reflexology, structural integrator and Asian bodywork therapy establishments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the regulation of massage, reflexology, structural integrator and Asian bodywork therapy establishments.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-01SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-02SenateHearing: 04/17/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 17
2019-03-29SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0812h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 111
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0812h (NT): Amendment Adopted DV 181-114 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 111
2019-03-07HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-07HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0812h (NT) for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-02-19HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/05/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/19/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-02-08HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-01-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-09House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/17/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/17/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2018-12-26HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 38

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback