NH HB1209 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to consultations under the telemedicine law.
Title
Relative to consultations under the telemedicine law.
Sponsors
Rep. James MacKay [D] | Rep. Kendall Snow [D] | Rep. John Fothergill [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Rep. Susan Ford [D] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 35 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 21 |
2016-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 02/17/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/11/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 4 P. 6 |