NH HB1208 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the number of first-year college students from New Hampshire high schools required to take remedial classes.
Title
Relative to the number of first-year college students from New Hampshire high schools required to take remedial classes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for TBD (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 2/11/2014 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/23/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Education |