NH HB1207 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-158 02/17/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-158 02/17/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring an employer to provide paid time off for an employee to vote.
Title
Requiring an employer to provide paid time off for an employee to vote.
Sponsors
Rep. Kat McGhee [D] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Rep. Gary Merchant [D] | Rep. Brodie Deshaies [R] |
Rep. Dan Wolf [R] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Anita Burroughs [D] | Rep. Joyce Weston [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - ITL (Y: 195 N: 158 NV: 9 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-158 02/17/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0286h |
2022-02-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-7; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/27/2022 09:30 am State HouseReps Hall |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 2:30 p.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2021-11-18 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |