NH HB1202 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-02 - Senate Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12, Pg.427
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-02 - Senate Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12, Pg.427
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amending the definition of sending district as it applies to students attending regional vocational education programs.
Title
Amending the definition of sending district as it applies to students attending regional vocational education programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Senate Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12, Pg.427 | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 5/2/12; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2012-04-04 | Senate Hearing: 4/10/12, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7, Pg.185 | |
2012-03-07 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0602h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1299 | |
2012-03-07 | House Amendment #0602h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1299 | |
2012-02-23 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-0602h (New Title); House Calendar 17, PG.978 | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0602h(NT) for Mar 7 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1062 | |
2012-02-03 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/3/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2011-12-15 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/2/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-12-15 | House Public Hearing: 1/31/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-11-15 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Education; House Journal 7, PG.347 |