NH HB1201 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to damage by bears.
Title
Relative to damage by bears.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-01 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305--307 |
2022-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 01/14/2022 9:45 a.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2021-11-18 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources |