NH HB1194 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a surcharge for certain single use plastics.
Title
Establishing a surcharge for certain single use plastics.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Balch [D] | Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] | Rep. Ivy Vann [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 5 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 4 |
2020-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/31/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 13 |