NH HB1188 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by the Governor on 7/22/2014; Chapter 0250; Section 1 Effective as provided in section 2; Remainder Effective 7/22/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by the Governor on 7/22/2014; Chapter 0250; Section 1 Effective as provided in section 2; Remainder Effective 7/22/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to paycheck equity.
Title
Relative to paycheck equity.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Weed [D] | Rep. Larry Phillips [D] | Rep. Marcia Moody [D] | Rep. Michael Cahill [D] |
Rep. Douglas Ley [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 207 N: 120 NV: 29 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 207 N: 120 NV: 40 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - OTP (Y: 183 N: 125 NV: 38 Abs: 46) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 207 N: 120 NV: 40 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - OTP (Y: 183 N: 125 NV: 38 Abs: 46) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/22/2014; Chapter 0250; Section 1 Effective as provided in section 2; Remainder Effective 7/22/2014. |
2014-06-18 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Report #1936c; Adopted, Regular Calendar 207-120 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1936c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2014-1936c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed |
2014-05-23 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/27/2014; 9:45 Amendment; Legislative Office Building 307 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Sanborn, Cataldo, and Larsen |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-22 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Andrew White, Ley, Jan Schmidt, Cahill |
2014-05-22 | House | Rep. Wallner moved to Non-Concur with Senate Amendment and request C of C; Motion Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1741s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1741s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1741s, 5/15/14; Senate Calendar 18 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing: 3/25/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce |
2014-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 183-125 |
2014-02-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-02-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 19 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 11 |
2014-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/11/2014 2:45 PM Legislative Office Building 307==Continued= |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/28/2014 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307==Recessed== |
2014-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/21/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |