NH HB1188 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 13, PG.743-744
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 13, PG.743-744
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to civil actions for defamation.
Title
Relative to civil actions for defamation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 13, PG.743-744 | |
2012-01-25 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 1 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 5, PG.246 | |
2012-01-11 | House Executive Session: 1/19/2012 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-12-27 | House Public Hearing: 1/10/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-11-14 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 7, PG.346 |