NH HB1186 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-20 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/10/2016; Chapter 235; Eff. 6/10/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-20 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/10/2016; Chapter 235; Eff. 6/10/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to coasting of vehicles.
Title
Relative to coasting of vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Schleien [R] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] | Rep. James Spillane [R] |
Rep. Jack Flanagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-20 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/10/2016; Chapter 235; Eff. 6/10/2016 |
2016-06-03 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 58 |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1869s (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 23 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1869s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment #2016-1869s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Moved Ought to Pass; 05/05/2016 Senate Journal 16 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/05/2016; Senate Calendar 17 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/05/2016, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 13 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0753h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 66 |
2016-03-09 | House | Amendment #2016-0753h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 66 |
2016-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0753h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 16-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 42 |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2016-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/02/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Transportation House Journal 4 P. 5 |