NH HB1186 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-13 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
Pending: House Resources, Recreation and Development Committee
Status: Introduced on December 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-13 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
Pending: House Resources, Recreation and Development Committee
Summary
Prohibiting smoking within certain areas of New Hampshire state parks and historic sites.
Title
Prohibiting smoking within certain areas of New Hampshire state parks and historic sites.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-13 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/26/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2010-05-12 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/17/2010 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2010-04-27 | House ==CANCELLED== Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/11/2010 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2010-04-21 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 4/27/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2010-03-17 | House Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development for Interim Study; House Journal 26, PG.1365 | |
2010-03-11 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 174-140; House Journal 24, PG.1328-1330 | |
2010-03-10 | House Special Ordered to Regular Place on Mar 11 Calendar, Without Objection; House Journal 23, PG.1294 | |
2010-02-16 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 19, PG.1036 | |
2010-02-16 | House Majority Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Mar 10 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19, PG.1036 | |
2010-02-10 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2010-02-02 | House Public Hearing: 2/11/2010 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 6, PG.231 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2116&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |