NH HB1184 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the establishment of revolving funds.
Title
Authorizing the establishment of revolving funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Douglas Trottier [R] | Rep. Richard Littlefield [R] | Rep. Travis O'Hara [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] |
Rep. Mike Bordes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/23/2022 9:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2022 11:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Municipal and County Government |