NH HB1176 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-19 - Executive Session: 09/27/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-19 - Executive Session: 09/27/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to nomination and qualification of fish and game commissioners.
Title
Relative to nomination and qualification of fish and game commissioners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | House | Executive Session: 09/27/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2016-06-01 | House | Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 06/07/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2016-03-09 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 33 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/09/2016 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 20 |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2016-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building307 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 4 P. 5 |