NH HB1161 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 164; Eff. 8/2/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 164; Eff. 8/2/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the traffic safety commission.
Title
Relative to the traffic safety commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 164; Eff. 8/2/2016 |
2016-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 24 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-11 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1393s (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 4 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1393s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1393s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2016 Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1393s, 04/21/2016; Senate Calendar 15 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Hearing: 04/12/2016, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0649h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 65 |
2016-03-09 | House | Amendment #2016-0649h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 65 |
2016-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0649h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 42 |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2016-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/16/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Transportation House Journal 4 P. 4 |