NH HB1153 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a political subdivision from adopting residency restrictions on sex offenders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting a political subdivision from adopting residency restrictions on sex offenders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-23 - House - OTP (Y: 264 N: 92 NV: 19 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Table (Y: 122 N: 237 NV: 16 Abs: 23) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-05SenatePending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16
2016-05-05SenateSen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16
2016-05-03SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/05/2016; Senate Calendar 17
2016-04-19SenateHearing: 04/26/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 16
2016-03-30SenateIntroduced 03/24/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11
2016-03-23HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 264-92 03/23/2016 House Journal 27 P. 44
2016-03-23HouseLay on Table (Rep. Webb): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 122-237 03/23/2016 House Journal 27 P. 42
2016-03-11HouseSpecial Order to calendar of 3/23/2016: Motion Adopted DV 275-25 By Necessary Two-Thirds Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 117
2016-03-09HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Spillane) 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 2
2016-02-25HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/09/2016 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 5
2016-02-25HouseExecutive Session: 02/17/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2016-02-10House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/17/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2016-02-10House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/01/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2016-02-10HouseIntroduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 4 P. 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback