NH HB1148 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 182-131 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 182-131 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the display of the national motto in schools.
Title
Relative to the display of the national motto in schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - ITL (Y: 182 N: 131 NV: 28 Abs: 55) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 182-131 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 7 |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 45 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/26/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 11 |