NH HB1148 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 163; Eff. 6/3/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 163; Eff. 6/3/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to review potential statutory revisions to constrain possible stranded costs associated with pipeline capacity contracts.
Title
Establishing a committee to review potential statutory revisions to constrain possible stranded costs associated with pipeline capacity contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. James McConnell [R] | Rep. James Coffey [R] | Rep. Susan Emerson [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Rep. Frank Byron [R] | Rep. Benjamin Tilton [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - OTP (Y: 208 N: 124 NV: 29 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - ITL (Y: 163 N: 169 NV: 29 Abs: 36) [FAIL]
2016-03-10 - House - ITL (Y: 163 N: 169 NV: 29 Abs: 36) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 163; Eff. 6/3/2016 |
2016-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 24 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-11 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1543s (Rep. Introne): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 4 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1543s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/28/2016; Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1543s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2016 Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1543s, New Title, 04/28/2016; Senate Calendar 16 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Hearing: ===RECONVENE=== 04/13/2016, Room 103, State House, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Hearing: ===RECESSED=== 04/13/2016, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-10 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 208-124 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 38 |
2016-03-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 163-169 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 38 |
2016-02-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass House Calendar 14 P. 70 |
2016-02-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 70 |
2016-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-01-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/28/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2016 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 4 P. 4 |