NH HB1144 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - House Signed By the Governor 05/07/2010; Effective 07/06/2010; Chapter 0018
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - House Signed By the Governor 05/07/2010; Effective 07/06/2010; Chapter 0018
Summary
Relative to the definition of a set line used for taking fish.
Title
Relative to the definition of a set line used for taking fish.
Sponsors
Rep. John Henson [D] | Rep. Amanda Merrill [D] | Rep. Rose Rogers [D] | Rep. Elisabeth Sanders [R] |
Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | House Signed By the Governor 05/07/2010; Effective 07/06/2010; Chapter 0018 | |
2010-04-21 | House Enrolled; House Journal 35, PG.1671 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 14, Pg.295 | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 14, Pg.294 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 4/14/10; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Hearing: April 6, 2010, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 2:35 p.m.; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Wildlife, Fish and Game & Agriculture | |
2010-01-27 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 12, PG.501 | |
2010-01-20 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jan 27 Consent Calendar (vote 13-0); House Calendar 8, PG.333 | |
2010-01-06 | House Executive Session: 1/19/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2009-12-22 | House Public Hearing: 1/14/2010 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources; House Journal 6, PG.230 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2140&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |