NH HB114 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2453h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2453h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to grocery sales by stores licensed to sell alcoholic beverages.
Title
Relative to grocery sales by stores licensed to sell alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2453h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 4 |
2015-10-15 | House | Executive Session: 10/27/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-10-14 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-10-07 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-09-29 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/6/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-03 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/17/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/5/2015 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/4/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-07 | House | Public Hearing: 1/15/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 7, PG. 117 |