NH HB1139 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 194-106 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 194-106 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to examine state protections from financial fraud.
Title
Establishing a committee to examine state protections from financial fraud.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 194-106 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 101 |
2016-03-02 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass House Calendar 14 P. 79 |
2016-03-02 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 79 |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2016-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 4 P. 3 |