NH HB1138 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/06/2016; Chapter 206; Eff. 6/6/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to access to investigational drugs, biological products, and devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to access to investigational drugs, biological products, and devices.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-13HouseSigned by Governor Hassan 06/06/2016; Chapter 206; Eff. 6/6/2016
2016-05-23HouseEnrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 24
2016-05-23SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19
2016-05-19HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1634s (Rep. Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 3
2016-05-05SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1634s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16
2016-05-05SenateCommittee Amendment 1634s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2016 Senate Journal 16
2016-04-27SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1634s, 05/05/2016; Senate Calendar 17
2016-04-14SenateHearing: 04/19/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 15
2016-03-22SenateIntroduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 10
2016-03-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0645h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 34
2016-03-09HouseAmendment #2016-0645h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 34
2016-03-02HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0645h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 21
2016-03-02HouseExecutive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
2016-02-09House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/17/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2016-02-09House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/26/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building205
2016-02-10HouseIntroduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 4 P. 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback