NH HB1135 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-28 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/23/2020; Chapter 29; I.Sec. 1-6 Eff: 09/21/2020 II. Sec. 18 Eff: 11/01/2024 III. Rem. Eff: 07/23/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-28 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/23/2020; Chapter 29; I.Sec. 1-6 Eff: 09/21/2020 II. Sec. 18 Eff: 11/01/2024 III. Rem. Eff: 07/23/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Naming a portion of route 49 in honor of Specialist Marc P. Decoteau; designating a portion of state route 125 as Officer Stephen Arkell Memorial Highway; declaring June 6 as D-Day Remembrance Day; proclaiming August 31 as Overdose Awareness Day; naming certain courtrooms in the tenth circuit district court and relative to circuit court, district and family division cases in Rockingham county; and relative to Holocaust and genocide studies legislation and establishing a commission to study genocide education.
Title
Naming a portion of route 49 in honor of Specialist Marc P. Decoteau; designating a portion of state route 125 as Officer Stephen Arkell Memorial Highway; declaring June 6 as D-Day Remembrance Day; proclaiming August 31 as Overdose Awareness Day; naming certain courtrooms in the tenth circuit district court and relative to circuit court, district and family division cases in Rockingham county; and relative to Holocaust and genocide studies legislation and establishing a commission to study genocide education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 350 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-28 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/23/2020; Chapter 29; I.Sec. 1-6 Eff: 09/21/2020 II. Sec. 18 Eff: 11/01/2024 III. Rem. Eff: 07/23/2020 |
2020-07-10 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 71 |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-30 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Cloutier): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 299-17 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 57 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1275s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved to Reconsider the vote on Ought to Pass with Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1275s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1275s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1275s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23 |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Members of the public may attend using the following links: |
2020-05-26 | Senate | The following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 20A |
2020-05-26 | Senate | 6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 20A |
2020-05-26 | Senate | 5. Webinar ID: 922 9361 7264 Senate Calendar 20A |
2020-05-26 | Senate | 4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13017158592,,92293617264# or 13126266799,,92293617264# Senate Calendar 20A |
2020-05-26 | Senate | 3. To listen via telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799, or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 20A |
2020-05-26 | Senate | 2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 20A |
2020-05-26 | Senate | 1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition to the bill and/or amendment, please register in advance by using this link: https://zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_4WsEKm4vRN6jbJpQAcONSA Senate Calendar 20A |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Committee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 20A |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 05/29/2020, 01:05 pm, on proposed amendment # 2020-1259s; Senate Calendar 20A |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 05/29/2020, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 20A |
2020-03-12 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/24/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:55 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-02-13 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 5 |
2020-02-13 | House | Special Order to front of regular calendar (Rep. Cloutier): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 5 |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/13/2020 (Vote 17-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 7 |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive Session: 01/28/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2020-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 201 (Pursuant to House Rule 43(b) an executive session may be held at the conclusion of committee hearing |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 1 P. 10 |