NH HB1130 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 295; I.Sec 4 & 5 eff 01/01/2023 II. Rem eff. 07/01/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 295; I.Sec 4 & 5 eff 01/01/2023 II. Rem eff. 07/01/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to restroom access for persons with certain medical conditions and relative to the procedure for obtaining a marriage license.
Title
Relative to restroom access for persons with certain medical conditions and relative to the procedure for obtaining a marriage license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 295; I.Sec 4 & 5 eff 01/01/2023 II. Rem eff. 07/01/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-22 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | House | Conference Committee Report 2022-2035c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2022-2035c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/26/2022; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2022-2035c; 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/17/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Avard, Ricciardi, Sherman; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2022-1679s 2022-1642s and Requests CofC (Reps. M. Pearson, B. King, Weber, Acton): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2022-1642s and 2022-1679s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sen. Avard Floor Amendment # 2022-1679s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2022-1642s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/21/2022; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Hearing: 04/14/2022, Room Reps Hall, State House, 12:10 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced 03/31/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-03-16 | House | Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 47(f) 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-02-23 | House | Amendment # 2022-0542h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety 02/16/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0542h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0542h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |