NH HB113 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB113
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the physical fitness performance requirements for law enforcement officers.
Title
Relative to the physical fitness performance requirements for law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 87 |
2024-01-03 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed DV 178-195 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 87 |
2024-01-03 | House | Lay HB113 on Table (Rep. Rhodes): Motion Failed DV 159-212 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 87 |
2023-11-17 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 11/15/2023 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 25 |
2023-11-09 | House | Executive Session: 11/15/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 45A |
2023-10-16 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 11/09/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 42 |
2023-09-07 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/22/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 36 |
2023-09-06 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 36 |
2023-08-31 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-02-24 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/24/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/09/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
Same As/Similar To
HB113 (Carry Over) 2023-09-07 - ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/22/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 36