NH HB1126 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-27 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-27 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limiting the authority of delegates to Article V conventions.
Title
Limiting the authority of delegates to Article V conventions.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] | Rep. Josh Moore [R] | Rep. Eric Eastman [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Paul Ingbretson [R] | Rep. Jordan Ulery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-27 | House | Died on Table |
2016-03-23 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Hinch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2016 House Journal 27 P. 65 |
2016-03-11 | House | Special Order to calendar of 3/23/2016: Motion Adopted DV 275-25 By Necessary Two-Thirds Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 117 |
2016-03-09 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Hoell) 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 2 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 7-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 29 |
2016-03-24 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2016 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2016-02-10 | House | Public Hearing: 02/16/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 4 P. 3 |