NH HB1111 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study extended producer responsibility.
Title
Establishing a commission to study extended producer responsibility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 01/18/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2022 9:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2021-11-16 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Environment and Agriculture |