NH HB111 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/20/2023; Chapter 81; Eff: 06/20/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/20/2023; Chapter 81; Eff: 06/20/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study electrical vehicle charging for residential renters.
Title
Establishing a committee to study electrical vehicle charging for residential renters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - Reconsider (Y: 170 N: 177 NV: 18 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2023-02-23 - House - Reconsider (Y: 170 N: 177 NV: 25 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2023-02-23 - House - Reconsider (Y: 170 N: 177 NV: 25 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-21 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/20/2023; Chapter 81; Eff: 06/20/2023 |
2023-06-13 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/08/2023); Senate Journal 19 |
2023-05-18 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2023-1246s (Rep. T. Walsh): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 P. 3 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-1246s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1246s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1246s, 04/13/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:20 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-23 | House | Reconsider HB111 (Rep. Adjutant): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 170-177 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 39 |
2023-02-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 175-172 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 37 |
2023-02-23 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed DV 172-174 02/23/2023 House Journal 7 P. 38 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB111 02/07/2023 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 27 |
2023-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Transportation |