NH HB1105 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/09/2016; Chapter 219; Eff. 6/9/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/09/2016; Chapter 219; Eff. 6/9/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study third party mortgage processors and relative to an exemption from certain employment laws for certain minors.
Title
Establishing a committee to study third party mortgage processors and relative to an exemption from certain employment laws for certain minors.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/09/2016; Chapter 219; Eff. 6/9/2016 |
2016-06-02 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 56 |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-05-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1991e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 27 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1991e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-11 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1219s and 1265s (Rep. Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 2 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 1219s, New Title and 1265s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/07/2016; Senate Journal 12 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2016-1265s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/07/2016; Senate Journal 12 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1219s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/07/2016 Senate Journal 12 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Without Objection, Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment #2016-1219s, New Title, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; 04/07/2016; Senate Journal 12 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment, 04/07/2016 Senate Journal 12 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1219s, New Title, 04/07/2016; Senate Calendar 13 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Hearing: 03/22/2016, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 03/10/2016 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 9 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 4 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/09/2016 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 78 |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2016-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 4 P. 2 |