NH HB1102 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring food service establishments to establish food allergy awareness procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring food service establishments to establish food allergy awareness procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - OTPA (Y: 232 N: 81 NV: 40 Abs: 43) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateIntroduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0437h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 232-81 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 67
2020-03-11HouseAmendment # 2020-0437h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 67
2020-03-11HouseSpecial Order to first order of business (Rep. Williams): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 67
2020-02-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2020-02-18HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0437h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 34
2020-01-23HouseExecutive Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-01-22HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/31/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-01-15HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 9

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback