NH HB110 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/31/2016; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/31/2016; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to placement of political advertising.
Title
Relative to placement of political advertising.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/31/2016; Senate Journal 11 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/31/2016; Senate Calendar 12 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Hearing: 03/16/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/18/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-01-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2395h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 34 |
2016-01-06 | House | Amendment #2015-2395h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 34 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2395h for Jan 6 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 6 |
2015-09-15 | House | Executive Session: 10/20/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-08-26 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/16/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-02-17 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-30 | House | ==CANCELED== Executive Session: 2/4/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 1/20/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 7, PG. 117 |