NH HB109 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Hearing: 03/15/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 13
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the occupational therapy practice act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the occupational therapy practice act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-08SenateHearing: 03/15/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 13
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9
2023-02-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2023-0214h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
2023-02-14HouseAmendment # 2023-0214h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
2023-02-09HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0214h 02/08/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 6
2023-02-02HouseExecutive Session: 02/08/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308
2023-01-24HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/27/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
2023-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/19/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308
2022-12-23HouseIntroduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback